Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Ragonesi

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1850Born
7 Sep 190453.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Colombia
16 Sep 190453.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Myra
25 Sep 190453.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Myra
9 Feb 191362.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
7 Mar 192170.2Elevated to Cardinal
7 Mar 192170.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
16 Jun 192170.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
9 Mar 192675.2AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
14 Sep 193180.7DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Francesco Ragonesi (VIAF: 87166645)
Francesco Cardinal Ragonesi (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBagnaia, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Death PlaceCaiano, Diocese of Pistoia, Italy

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 98, and Page 240
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 581, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 649, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 695, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast