Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopoldo Duarte e Silva

Deceased

Archbishop of São Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1867Born
30 Oct 189225.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 190437.0AppointedBishop of Curitiba, Brazil
22 May 190437.1Ordained BishopBishop of Curitiba, Brazil
2 Oct 190437.4InstalledBishop of Curitiba, Brazil
18 Dec 190639.7AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
14 Apr 190740.0InstalledBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
7 Jun 190841.1AppointedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil
13 Nov 193871.6DiedArchbishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Duarte e Silva (VIAF: 76210004)
Archbishop Leopoldo Duarte e Silva (born , died ) Archbishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaubaté

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1904, Number 24
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 113, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 983, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,115, Ascendance
  • ln: CB, 9 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Dec 2020

Quantcast