Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antun Bauer

Deceased

Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1856Born
27 Jul 187923.4Ordained PriestPriest of Zagreb, Croatia
20 Jan 191154.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
20 Jan 191154.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
29 Jan 191154.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Pessinus
26 Apr 191458.2SucceededArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia
7 Dec 193781.8DiedArchbishop of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Antun Bauer
Archbishop Antun Bauer (born , died ) Archbishop of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBreznica, Archdiocese of Zagreb
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceZagreb, Archdiocese of Zagreb

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1911, Number 8
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 570, Ascendance
  • fn: CB, 1 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Apr 2021

Quantcast