Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Altenweisel

Deceased

Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1851Born
10 Jun 187624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
6 May 190452.4SelectedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
2 Jul 190452.5ConfirmedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
11 Sep 190452.7Ordained BishopBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
26 Jun 1912³60.5DiedBishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josef Altenweisel
Bishop Josef Altenweisel (born , died ) Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiederdorf

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1904, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 93
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 847, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast