Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Magnani

Bishop Emeritus of Treviso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1926 Born
29 Jun 195124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
27 Jul 197750.5AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
10 Sep 197750.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
19 Nov 198861.8AppointedBishop of Treviso, Italy
11 Feb 198962.1InstalledBishop of Treviso, Italy
3 Dec 200376.9RetiredBishop of Treviso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Magnani
Bishop Paolo Magnani (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Treviso

EventPlace
Birth PlacePieve Porto Morone
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne et Assomption, Cathedral, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Treviso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 59, Number 4,424
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 95, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast