Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corrado Pizziolo

Bishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1949 Born
20 Sep 197525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
19 Nov 200757.9AppointedBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy
26 Jan 200858.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vittorio Veneto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corrado Pizziolo
Bishop Corrado Pizziolo (born ) Bishop of Vittorio Veneto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScandolara di Zero Branco, Diocese of Treviso
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vittorio Veneto, Diocese of Vittorio Veneto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vittorio Veneto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast