Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Castelli

Deceased

Bishop of Novara, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1871Born
8 Jun 189523.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 Aug 191139.7AppointedBishop of Susa, Italy
28 Oct 191139.9Ordained BishopBishop of Susa, Italy
14 Jan 191240.1InstalledBishop of Susa, Italy
22 Dec 192049.1AppointedBishop of Cuneo, Italy
6 May 192149.4InstalledBishop of Cuneo, Italy
21 Oct 192452.9AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
15 Feb 192553.2InstalledBishop of Novara, Italy
12 Sep 194371.8DiedBishop of Novara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Castelli
(VIAF: 90372779; WikiData: Q3770278)
Bishop Giuseppe Castelli (born , died ) Bishop of Novara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Gillio

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 83
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 480, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,027, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 1 Jun 2023