Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Magnasco

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1806Born
20 Sep 182822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Genova, Italy
22 May 186862.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova, Italy
22 May 186862.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
28 Jun 186862.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bolina
27 Oct 187165.8AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
12 Jan 189286.0DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Magnasco (VIAF: 59889710)
Archbishop Salvatore Magnasco (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortofno, Archdiocese of Genova
Ordained BishopSte Marie Majeure, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 152, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 22
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 480, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 758, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,027, Ascendance
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast