Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Paul André Denis Marcel James

Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1952 Born
22 Sep 198533.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
9 Jan 200350.4AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
6 Apr 200350.7Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
8 Jul 200956.9AppointedBishop of Nantes, France
14 Nov 201967.3AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
26 Jan 202067.5InstalledArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul André Denis Marcel James (VIAF: 306129877)
Archbishop Jean-Paul André Denis Marcel James (born ) Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Beauvais, Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bordeaux (-Bazas).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,363
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast