Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Sales Marie Adrien Saint-Macary

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1936Born
29 Jun 196024.4Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 198347.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Nice, France
24 Apr 198347.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Nice, France
30 Apr 198448.3SucceededBishop of Nice, France
14 Nov 199761.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
1 Sep 199862.6SucceededArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
26 Mar 200771.2DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for François de Sales Marie Adrien Saint-Macary
Archbishop François de Sales Marie Adrien Saint-Macary (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrthez
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Bayonne, Diocese of Bayonne (-Lescar e Oloron)

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Number 6,438

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast