Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacques André Marie Jullien

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1929Born
4 Oct 195324.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
3 Apr 195424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon), France
20 Sep 197849.3AppointedBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
12 Nov 197849.5Ordained BishopBishop of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis), France
21 May 198455.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
15 Oct 198556.4SucceededArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
1 Sep 199869.3ResignedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
10 Dec 201283.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Jacques André Marie Jullien (VIAF: 36920237)
Archbishop Jacques André Marie Jullien (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrest, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained DeaconMajor Seminary, Chapel, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained PriestMajor Seminary, Chapel, Quimper, Diocese of Quimper [Cornouailles](-Léon)
Ordained BishopSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Beauvais, Diocese of Beauvais (-Noyon-Senlis)
Death PlaceRennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Pierre, Cathedral, Rennes, Archdiocese of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 10 Dec 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,451
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 11 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Feb 2021

Quantcast