Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Henryk Roman Cardinal Gulbinowicz

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

Cardinal-Priest of Immacolata Concezione di Maria a Grottarossa

Note/Previous Titular See: (AA for Polish territory)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1923Born
18 Jun 195026.6Ordained PriestPriest of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jan 197046.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Vilnius, Lithuania
12 Jan 197046.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Acci
8 Feb 197046.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acci
3 Jan 197652.2AppointedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
25 May 198561.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198561.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Immacolata Concezione di Maria a Grottarossa
3 Apr 200480.4RetiredArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
16 Nov 202097.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Roman Gulbinowicz (VIAF: 4765003)
Henryk Roman Cardinal Gulbinowicz (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Wrocław {Breslavia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSukiškes, Archdiocese of Vilnius, Lithuania
Ordained PriestAssumption, Co-Cathedral, Białystok, Diocese of Białystok
Ordained BishopAssumption, Pro-Cathedral, Białystok, Diocese of Białystok
Death PlaceWrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 50.7 years
  • a cardinal for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 18, Number 933
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast