Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Małachowski

Deceased

Bishop of Kraków, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1623Born
165532.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lviv, Ukraine
22 Jun 167653.4AppointedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
4 Feb 167754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
12 May 168158.3AppointedBishop of Kraków, Poland
20 Aug 169976.6DiedBishop of Kraków, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Małachowski (VIAF: 311275748)
Bishop Jan Małachowski (born 1623, died ) Bishop of Kraków

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Jean, Cathedral, Varsovie

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,855
  • fn: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 8
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 355
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast