Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Dyczkowski

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1932Born
24 Jun 195724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
19 Sep 197845.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
19 Sep 197845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
25 Nov 197846.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altava
25 Mar 199259.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Legnica, Poland
17 Jul 199360.6AppointedBishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland
5 Sep 199360.8InstalledBishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland
29 Dec 200775.1RetiredBishop of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland
10 Jan 202188.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Zielona Góra-Gorzów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Adam Dyczkowski (VIAF: 313280524)
Bishop Adam Dyczkowski (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKęty
Ordained BishopSt. John, Cathedral, Wrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
Death PlaceRetirement Priest's House, Zielona Góra, Diocese of Zielona Góra-Gorzów

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,453
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast