Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Mendyk

Bishop of Świdnica, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1961 Born
23 May 198726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
25 Mar 199231.0IncardinatedPriest of Legnica, Poland
24 Dec 200847.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Legnica, Poland
24 Dec 200847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
31 Jan 200947.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusuccuru
31 Mar 202059.0AppointedBishop of Świdnica, Poland
12 Sep 202059.4InstalledBishop of Świdnica, Poland

MicroData Summary for Marek Mendyk
Bishop Marek Mendyk (born ) Bishop of Świdnica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGluszyca, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
Ordained PriestCathedral, Wrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}
Ordained BishopSaints Pierre et Paul, Cathedral, Legnica, Diocese of Legnica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Świdnica.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,051
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast