Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Włodzimierz Roman Juszczak, O.S.B.M.

Bishop of Wrocław-Koszalin (Ukrainian), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1957 Born
18 Jun 197820.9ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1 May 198325.7Solemn VowsMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
8 May 198325.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
28 May 198325.8Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
24 Apr 199941.7AppointedBishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland
19 Jun 199941.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Włodzimierz Roman Juszczak
Bishop Włodzimierz Roman Juszczak O.S.B.M. (born ) Bishop of Wrocław-Koszalin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLegnica
Ordained DeaconWarsaw
Ordained PriestLegnica
Ordained BishopSaints Vincent et Jacob, Church, Wrocław, Diocese of Wrocław-Gdańsk (Ukrainian)

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Wrocław-Koszalin (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,570
  • prof/sole: CB, 6 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 25 Jan 2021

Quantcast