Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Tyrawa

Bishop Emeritus of Bydgoszcz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1948 Born
26 May 197324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
24 Sep 198839.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
24 Sep 198839.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
5 Nov 198840.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sinna
24 Feb 200455.3AppointedBishop of Bydgoszcz, Poland
28 Mar 200455.3InstalledBishop of Bydgoszcz, Poland
12 May 202172.5ResignedBishop of Bydgoszcz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Tyrawa
Bishop Jan Tyrawa (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bydgoszcz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKuznice Swidnickie
Ordained BishopWrocław, Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bydgoszcz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,567
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 12 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 May 2021

Quantcast