Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mohilev

Archidioecesis Mohiloviensis Latinorum

United

To: Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
15 April 1783ErectedArchdiocese of Mohilev (erected)
9 August 1798Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev Diocese of Minsk (erected)
3 July 1848Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev Diocese of Cherson (erected)
22 September 1918Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev
Diocese of Žemaičiai (Samogizia o Tels; Żmudź)
Diocese of Riga (erected)
8 June 1920Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev Vicariate Apostolic of Finland {Finlandia} (erected)
10 March 1926Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev Apostolic Administration of Kharkiv (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Mohilev (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Moscow (erected)
10 March 1926Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev
Diocese of Tiraspol
Apostolic Administration of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk (erected)
11 April 1926Territory LostArchdiocese of Mohilev Apostolic Administration of Leningrad (erected)
13 April 1991UnitedApostolic Administration of Kharkiv (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Kazan-Samara-Simbirsk (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Leningrad (suppressed)
Diocese of Minsk
Archdiocese of Mohilev
Apostolic Administration of Mohilev (suppressed)
Apostolic Administration of Moscow (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Minsk-Mohilev

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast