Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Pio Gaspari

Deceased

Apostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan

Titular Archbishop of Numida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1918Born
21 Jul 194022.2Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197355.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Numida
6 Jun 197355.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
29 Jun 197355.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Numida
16 Nov 197759.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan
23 Jun 198365.2DiedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan

MicroData Summary for Mario Pio Gaspari
Archbishop Mario Pio Gaspari (born , died ) Apostolic Pro-Nuncio of Japan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS. Felice sul Panaro
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,183
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 23, Number 1,281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast