Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Japan



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 28 April 1952
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Japan
  • Mailing Address: Chiyoda-ku, 9-2 Sanban-cho, Tokyo 102-0075, Japan
  • Telephone: (81-3)3263-6851
  • Fax: 3263.6060

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Japan
26 November 1919EstablishedDelegation to Japan
Nunciature to Japan
28 April 1952ElevatedDelegation to Japan Nunciature to Japan (to Internunciature)
24 October 1966ElevatedNunciature to Japan (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 9 Sep 2020

Quantcast