Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Genaro Alamilla Arteaga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Papantla, Puebla, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1914Born
10 Oct 194329.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jul 197460.0AppointedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
19 Sep 197460.2Ordained BishopBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
26 Jan 198065.5RetiredBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
26 Jan 198065.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
10 Oct 198975.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
20 Nov 200490.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Papantla, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Genaro Alamilla Arteaga
Bishop Genaro Alamilla Arteaga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Papantla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Papantla, Diocese of Papantla, Puebla

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 39, Number 2,426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast