Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francis Xavier Kaname Shimamoto, Ist. del Prado †

Deceased

Archbishop of Nagasaki, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1932Born
23 Nov 195826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Istituto del Prado
20 Dec 197947.8AppointedBishop of Urawa, Japan
20 Mar 198048.0Ordained BishopBishop of Urawa, Japan
8 Feb 199057.9AppointedArchbishop of Nagasaki, Japan
31 Aug 200270.5DiedArchbishop of Nagasaki, Japan

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Kaname Shimamoto
Archbishop Francis Xavier Kaname Shimamoto Ist. del Prado (born , died ) Archbishop of Nagasaki

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGoto
Ordained BishopUrawa, Diocese of Urawa

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 60, Number 4,560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 19 Dec 2020

Quantcast