Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juvenal Porcayo Uribe

Deceased

Bishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1917Born
20 Jul 194124.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chilapa, Guerrero, México
18 Mar 195840.8IncardinatedPriest of Acapulco, Guerrero, México
3 Jul 197659.1AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
8 Sep 197659.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
30 Jun 198366.1DiedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México

MicroData Summary for Juvenal Porcayo Uribe
Bishop Juvenal Porcayo Uribe (born , died ) Bishop of Tapachula

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenavista de Cuellar
Ordained BishopTapachula, Diocese of Tapachula, Chiapas
Death PlaceHighway N. 95
Buried Place (Original)San Agustín de Hipona, Cathedral, Tapachula, Diocese of Tapachula, Chiapas

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 6.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,525

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast