Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Serafim Cardinal Fernandes de Araújo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Cardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1924Born
12 Mar 194924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Diamantina, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jan 195934.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jan 195934.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
7 May 195934.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
22 Nov 198258.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Feb 198661.4SucceededArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
21 Feb 199873.5Elevated to Cardinal
21 Feb 199873.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort
25 Oct 199874.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Luigi Maria Grignion de Montfort
28 Jan 200479.4RetiredArchbishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Oct 201995.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Serafim Fernandes de Araújo
Serafim Cardinal Fernandes de Araújo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMinas Novas, Diocese of Araçuaí (Arassuaí), Minas Gerais
Ordained PriestSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopDiamantina, Archdiocese of Diamantina, Minas Gerais
Death PlaceBelo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais
Buried Place (Original)Santuário de Adoração Perpétua Nossa Senhora da Boa Viagem, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 70.5 years
  • a bishop for 60.4 years
  • a cardinal for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i: Bollettino, 29 Sep 1998
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 40
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • d: CB, 8 Oct 2019
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 12 Jan 2021

Quantcast