Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nivaldo dos Santos Ferreira

Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Thiava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1967 Born
27 May 199527.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 May 199628.9Ordained PriestPriest of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Dec 202053.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Dec 202053.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Thiava
11 Feb 202153.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thiava

MicroData Summary for Nivaldo dos Santos Ferreira
Bishop Nivaldo dos Santos Ferreira (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarbacena, Archdiocese of Mariana, Minas Gerais
Ordained DeaconSanto Antônio, Church, Jaraguá
Ordained PriestSão Sebastião, Church, Barro Preto
Ordained BishopCristo Rei, Cathedral, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2020
  • od/ob/c01: CB, 23 Dec 2020
  • c2+: CB, 12 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast