Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Werner Franz Siebenbrock, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1937Born
1 May 196527.5ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
18 Dec 196528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
12 Oct 198851.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
12 Oct 198851.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
18 Dec 198851.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tacia Montana
9 Nov 199457.1AppointedBishop of Nova Iguaçu, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
19 Dec 200164.2AppointedBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Mar 201476.4RetiredBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Dec 201982.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Werner Franz Siebenbrock
Bishop Werner Franz Siebenbrock S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Governador Valadares

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Germany
Ordained BishopStade Mina Tariz, Belo Horizonte, Archdiocese of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais
Death PlaceJuiz de Fora, Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais
Buried Place (Original)Society of the Divine Word tomb, Juiz de Fora, Archdiocese of Juiz de Fora, Minas Gerais

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,132
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2014
  • d: CB, 24 Dec 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Deceased Cardinals (back), Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast