Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David Dias Pimentel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1941Born
21 Dec 196928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Dec 199655.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Belo Horizonte, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Dec 199655.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
31 Jan 199755.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
7 Feb 200159.8AppointedBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Mar 200160.0InstalledBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Sep 201675.5RetiredBishop of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Mar 202179.9DiedBishop Emeritus of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for David Dias Pimentel
Bishop David Dias Pimentel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São João da Boa Vista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Miguel dos Acores, Portugal
Ordained BishopSão José, Cathedral, São José do Rio Preto, Diocese of Rio Preto, Sao Paulo
Death PlaceUnimed, Hospital, São João da Boa Vista, Diocese of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, São João da Boa Vista, Diocese of São João da Boa Vista, Sao Paulo

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,915
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 16 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast