Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valerian D’Souza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Poona, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1933Born
29 Jun 196127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Poona, India
7 Jul 197743.7AppointedBishop of Poona, India
25 Sep 197743.9Ordained BishopBishop of Poona, India
4 Apr 200975.5RetiredBishop of Poona, India
25 Feb 202086.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Poona, India

MicroData Summary for Valerian D’Souza (VIAF: 4897009)
Bishop Valerian D’Souza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Poona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePune
Ordained BishopStade Ecole St Vincent, Poona, Diocese of Poona
Death PlaceHadaspar

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2009
  • d: CB, 26 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 45, Number 3,068

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast