Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kurt Richard Burnette

Bishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1955 Born
26 Apr 198933.4Ordained PriestPriest of Van Nuys (Ruthenian), California, USA
29 Oct 201357.9AppointedBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
4 Dec 201358.0Ordained BishopBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
20 Oct 202064.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Kurt Richard Burnette
Bishop Kurt Richard Burnette (born ) Bishop of Passaic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFakenham, Norfolk, Diocese of Northampton, England, Great Britain
Ordained PriestPittsburgh, PA, Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Michael the Archangel, Cathedral, Passaic, NJ, Eparchy of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Passaic (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2013
  • c2+: CB, 20 Nov 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 153
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,986
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast