Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Kudrick

Bishop Emeritus of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1947 Born
3 May 197527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
May 198739.3IncardinatedPriest of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
3 May 200254.3AppointedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
10 Jul 200254.5Ordained BishopBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
7 May 201668.3ResignedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael Kudrick
Bishop John Michael Kudrick (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLloydell, PA

Please contact the Bishop through the Eparchy of Parma (Ruthenian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,222
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast