Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael Bilock

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA

Titular Bishop of Pergamum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1916Born
3 Feb 194629.6Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
1 Mar 197356.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Munhall (Ruthenian), USA
1 Mar 197356.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pergamum
15 May 197356.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pergamum
8 Sep 199478.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael Bilock
Bishop John Michael Bilock (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pittsburgh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMcAdoo
Ordained PriestBishop's, Chapel, Munhall, Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopHoly Spirit, Church, Oakland, PA, Archeparchy of Munhall (Ruthenian)
Buried Place (Original)Mount Saint Macrina, Cemetery, Uniontown, PA, Archeparchy of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,178
  • c1: CB, 21 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast