Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicholas Thomas Elko

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

Titular Archbishop of Dara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1909Born
30 Sep 193424.7Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
2 Dec 195444.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
5 Feb 195545.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonias
6 Mar 195545.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonias
5 Sep 195545.7AppointedApostolic Exarch of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
6 Jul 196353.5AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania, USA
22 Dec 196758.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dara
10 Aug 197161.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
16 Apr 198575.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
18 May 199181.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Thomas Elko (VIAF: 70974923)
Archbishop Nicholas Thomas Elko (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonora, PA

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 12
  • opd/c1: CB, 20 Jun 2015
  • ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 444, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast