Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Cleocir Bonetti

Bishop-Elect of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1972 Born
4 Jan 199825.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Feb 199926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
30 Jun 202148.8AppointedBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
12 Sep 202149.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil
3 Oct 202149.1InstalledBishop of Caçador, Santa Catarina, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cleocir Bonetti
Father Cleocir Bonetti (born ) Bishop-Elect of Caçador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Valentim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained DeaconSão Valentim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained PriestSão Valentim, Church, São Valentim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul
Ordained BishopCathedral, Erexim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Caçador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2021
  • od/loc: CB, 30 Jun 2021
  • ob/i: CB, 2 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Jul 2021

Quantcast