Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Caxias do Sul

Dioecesis Caxiensis Australis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • José Gislon, O.F.M. Cap., Bishop
  • Alessandro Carmelo Ruffinoni, C.S., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 19 October 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Porto Alegre
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rio Grande do Sul
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 11,892 (4,593 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Sul 3
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesedecaxias.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, Rua Os 18 do Forte 1771, 95020-472 Caxias do Sul, RS, Brazil
  • Telephone: (054)3214-5388

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Caxias
8 September 1934ErectedArchdiocese of Porto Alegre Diocese of Caxias (erected)
Territorial Prelature of Vacaria (erected)
27 April 1959Territory AddedArchdiocese of Porto Alegre (Mussum and Santa Lucia do Piai (of Caxias do Sul)) Diocese of Caxias
16 May 1966Territory LostDiocese of Caxias (Nossa Senhora das Graças (in Our Lady of the Purification) and São José (in Saint John the Baptist)) Diocese of Passo Fundo
16 May 1966Territory AddedDiocese of Passo Fundo (Santa Bárbara, Santa Teresinha, Nossa Senhora das Graças, Sao Jerónimo, Santa Ana (all in San Valentin) and São Paulo (in San Rochi)) Diocese of Caxias
Diocese of Caxias do Sul
19 October 1966Name ChangedDiocese of Caxias Diocese of Caxias do Sul
23 November 1970Territory AddedArchdiocese of Porto Alegre (S. Francis de Paula) Diocese of Caxias do Sul
12 December 1997Territory LostDiocese of Caxias do Sul (Santa Maria de Purificationa (in Muçum) and Saint John the Baptist (in Vespasiano Correa)) Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul
10 November 1999Territory LostDiocese of Caxias do Sul
Archdiocese of Porto Alegre
Diocese of Osório (erected) (Arroio do Sal, Balneario Pinhal, Capão da Canoa, Capivari do Sul, Caraá, Cidreira, Dom Pedro de Alcantara, Imbé, Itati, Mampituba, Maquiné, Morrinhos do Sul, Osório, Palmares do Sul, Santo Antonio da Patrulha, Terra de Areia, Torres, Tramandai, Tres ...)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Caxias
1950220,000223,00098.7%59601191,84813627043ap1951
1959320,000325,00098.5%941001941,64923869558ap1960
Diocese of Caxias do Sul
1966360,000370,00097.3%1081052131,69029895469ap1967
1970390,000400,00097.5%921122041,911122684972ap1971
1976466,448485,33596.1%92911832,548421676175ap1977
1980554,890590,00094.0%95911862,983428488077ap1981
1990720,000800,00090.0%97871843,913121063076ap1991
1999619,050659,66593.8%90821723,599117350265ap2000
2000619,050659,66593.8%90821723,599114750265ap2001
2001643,500715,00090.0%110801903,386115646868ap2002
2002642,338713,70990.0%110881983,24416346070ap2003
2003661,617735,13090.0%110821923,44515448670ap2004
2004668,232742,48190.0%109831923,48015048570ap2005
2006696,000773,00090.0%104811853,76214747170ap2007
2013763,000848,00090.0%102801824,19215141774ap2014
2016834,500925,99690.1%100711714,88012437374ap2017
2019853,500947,44090.1%103741774,82212434274ap2020
2021892,200990,67290.1%98641625,5079934174ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Caxias
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 649, and Page 650
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 594, and Page 595
  • Diocese of Caxias do Sul
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 1,193
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 63, Page 238, and Page 239

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 13 Jun 2024