Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Robert Binzer

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

Titular Bishop of Subbar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1955 Born
4 Jun 199439.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
6 Apr 201155.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
6 Apr 201155.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Subbar
9 Jun 201156.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subbar
7 May 202065.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Robert Binzer
Bishop Joseph Robert Binzer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Ordained BishopSaint Peter in Chains, Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Cincinnati.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,074
  • r: Bollettino, 7 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast