Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Edward Pilarczyk

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1934Born
20 Dec 195925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
12 Nov 197440.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
12 Nov 197440.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hodelm
20 Dec 197440.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hodelm
30 Oct 198248.2AppointedArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
20 Dec 198248.3InstalledArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
21 Dec 200975.3RetiredArchbishop of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
22 Mar 202085.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Edward Pilarczyk (VIAF: 1628343)
Archbishop Daniel Edward Pilarczyk (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cincinnati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDayton
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Death PlaceCincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 22 Mar 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast