Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Daniel Conlon

Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1948 Born
15 Jan 197728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
31 May 200253.4AppointedBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
6 Aug 200253.6Ordained BishopBishop of Steubenville, Ohio, USA
17 May 201162.4AppointedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
14 Jul 201162.6InstalledBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA
4 May 202071.4ResignedBishop of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Daniel Conlon
Bishop Robert Daniel Conlon (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Joliet in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCincinnati, OH, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio
Ordained BishopFinnegan Field House, Franciscan University, Steubenville, Diocese of Steubenville, Ohio

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Joliet in Illinois.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,236
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast