Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François de Harlay de Champvallon

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1625Born
23 May 165125.7SelectedArchbishop of Rouen, France
28 Oct 165126.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Rouen, France
28 Dec 165126.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rouen, France
4 Jan 167145.3SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
23 Feb 167145.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
6 Aug 169569.9DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for François de Harlay de Champvallon
Archbishop François de Harlay de Champvallon (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 298
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 30
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 298, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 644, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast