Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

Dioecesis Maurianensis

United

To: Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
6th CenturyErectedDiocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne (erected)
29 November 1801SuppressedDiocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne (suppressed)
Archdiocese of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise) (suppressed)
Diocese of Chambéry
Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
7 August 1825ErectedArchdiocese of Chambéry Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne (erected)
26 April 1966UnitedArchdiocese of Chambéry
Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
Diocese of Tarentaise
Archdiocese of Chambéry (-Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne-Tarentaise)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
194842,00043,11597.4%12712733021589ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 331
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 187, and Page 188
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 281

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 9 Jun 2020

Quantcast