Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry-Camille-Gustave-Marie L’Heureux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1921Born
1 Mar 194725.4Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
26 Jan 197149.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
26 Jan 197149.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Celene
27 Mar 197149.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celene
3 Feb 197250.3AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
30 Nov 198160.1ResignedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
19 Mar 198664.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Henry-Camille-Gustave-Marie L’Heureux
Bishop Henry-Camille-Gustave-Marie L’Heureux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Perpignan-Elne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille, Diocese of Marseille
Ordained BishopSte. Marie Majeure, Cathedral, Marseille, Archdiocese of Marseille

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast