Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Christophe de Beaumont du Repaire

Deceased

Archbishop of Paris, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1703Born
19 Jun 173430.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Aug 174138.0SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
27 Nov 174138.3ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
24 Dec 174138.4Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
20 Apr 174541.7SelectedArchbishop of Vienne, France
8 Jul 174541.9ResignedBishop of Bayonne, France
23 Aug 174542.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Vienne, France
5 Aug 174643.0SelectedArchbishop of Paris, France
19 Sep 174643.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Paris, France
12 Dec 178178.3DiedArchbishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Christophe de Beaumont du Repaire
Archbishop Christophe de Beaumont du Repaire (born , died ) Archbishop of Paris

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâteau de la Roque

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 63
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 113, and Page 329
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 441
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 298, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 425, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 551, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 644, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,025, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast