Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Toluca

Archidioecesis Tolucensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 September 2019
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: México
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 4,815 (1,859 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Metro-Circundante
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesistoluca.org.mx/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 82, Portal Reforma 104 Col. Centro, 50000 Toluca, Méx., México
  • Telephone: (722)215-25-35; 215-39-59
  • Fax: 214-69-55

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Toluca
4 June 1950ErectedArchdiocese of México Diocese of Toluca (erected)
27 October 1964Territory LostDiocese of Acapulco
Diocese of Chilapa
Diocese of Toluca
Diocese of Tacámbaro
Diocese of Ciudad Altamirano (erected)
3 November 1984Territory LostDiocese of Toluca Diocese of Atlacomulco (erected)
26 November 2009Territory LostDiocese of Toluca Diocese of Tenancingo (erected)
Archdiocese of Toluca
28 September 2019ElevatedDiocese of Toluca Archdiocese of Toluca

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Toluca
19501,000,000.0%6565053ap1951
1966865,321875,32198.9%155602154,02411847098ap1967
1968865,269875,32198.9%159331924,50662520108ap1971
1976950,700957,10999.3%184392234,26368460122ap1977
19801,029,0001,130,00091.1%191382294,49357383124ap1981
19901,949,0002,079,00093.7%176322089,37037330118ap1991
19993,620,0884,000,00090.5%2255027513,16372305124ap2000
20002,959,3293,115,08395.0%2393127010,96053305124ap2001
20013,015,5553,174,26995.0%2433227510,96555315124ap2002
20022,878,7753,234,58089.0%2375028710,03068415125ap2003
20032,878,7753,234,58089.0%252472999,62861380128ap2004
20042,940,9753,337,28088.1%253483019,77063387128ap2005
20103,105,0003,318,00093.6%298483468,97383413142ap2011
20122,341,0002,747,00085.2%253332868,18545330129ap2015
20172,286,5322,852,14780.2%243382818,13761303139ap2018
Archdiocese of Toluca

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast