Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Aquin Carew

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Japan

Titular Archbishop of Telde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1922BornSt. Johnís, Newfoundland, Canada
15 Jun 194724.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Nov 196947.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Telde
27 Nov 196947.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Burundi
27 Nov 196947.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Rwanda
4 Jan 197047.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Telde
10 May 197451.5AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Cyprus
10 May 197451.5AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
30 Aug 198360.8AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan
11 Nov 199775.0RetiredApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Japan
8 May 201289.5DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Japan

MicroData Summary for William Aquin Carew:
Archbishop William Aquin Carew (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Japan

  • a priest for 64.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 9 May 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015