Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas John Flynn

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

Titular Archbishop of Silyum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1892Born
22 Jun 191927.1Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 194552.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
7 Apr 194552.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Silyum
24 Jun 194553.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Silyum
7 Sep 194957.3DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Thomas John Flynn
Archbishop Thomas John Flynn (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlacentia Bay
Ordained BishopSt. Jean Baptiste, Cathedral, Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,945, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,543

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast