Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Thomas Mullock, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1807Born
10 Apr 183022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
14 Dec 184740.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Newfoundland, Canada
14 Dec 184740.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
27 Dec 184740.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
14 Jul 185042.7SucceededBishop of Newfoundland, Canada
29 Feb 185648.4AppointedBishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada
29 Mar 186961.5DiedBishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for John Thomas Mullock (VIAF: 48384517)
Bishop John Thomas Mullock O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Saint John’s, Newfoundland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Mary's Parish, Ireland
Ordained BishopS. Isidore, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 322, and Page 544
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1847, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017