Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Louis O’Donel, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Newfoundland

Titular Bishop of Nilopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1737²BornKnocklofty, Ireland
1770²33.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
17 May 178447.3AppointedPrefect of Newfoundland, Canada
23 Dec 179558.9SelectedVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
23 Dec 179558.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nilopolis
5 Jan 179659.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
22 Jan 179659.0ConfirmedVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
22 Jan 179659.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
21 Sep 179659.7Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
1 Jan 180770.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Newfoundland, Canada
1 Jan 180770.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Iles Saint-Pierre et Miquelon
1 Apr 181174.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Newfoundland, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Louis O’Donel (VIAF: 65438518)
Bishop James Louis O’Donel O.F.M. Obs. (born 1737, died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Newfoundland

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 406, and Page 454
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 4 Mar 2016