Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Brian Joseph Dunn

Coadjutor Archbishop of Halifax-Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1955 Born
28 Aug 198025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
16 Jul 200853.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie, Ontario, Canada
16 Jul 200853.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
9 Oct 200853.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
21 Nov 200954.8AppointedBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
25 Jan 201055.0InstalledBishop of Antigonish, Nova Scotia, Canada
13 Apr 201964.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Halifax-Yarmouth, Nova Scotia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Brian Joseph Dunn
Archbishop Brian Joseph Dunn (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Halifax-Yarmouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint John’s, Newfoundland, Archdiocese of Saint John’s, Newfoundland
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Grand Falls-Windsor, Diocese of Grand Falls, Newfoundland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Halifax-Yarmouth.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,978
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast