Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Bertram Leverman

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1903BornSaint John’s, Newfoundland
21 May 193228.6Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 194844.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Halifax, Nova Scotia, Canada
24 Apr 194844.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Baris in Pisidia
29 Jun 194844.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baris in Pisidia
27 Jul 195349.8AppointedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
7 Sep 196864.9ResignedBishop of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
7 Sep 196864.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Altava
23 Nov 197067.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Altava
28 Apr 197268.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada

MicroData Summary for Alfred Bertram Leverman:
Bishop Alfred Bertram Leverman (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint John, New Brunswick

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015