Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cornelius Michael Power

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1913Born
3 Jun 193925.4Ordained PriestPriest of Seattle, Washington, USA
5 Feb 196955.1AppointedBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
1 May 196955.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
20 May 196955.4InstalledBishop of Yakima, Washington, USA
15 Jan 197460.0AppointedArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
17 Apr 197460.3InstalledArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
1 Jul 198672.5RetiredArchbishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
22 May 199783.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Michael Power (VIAF: 34081936)
Archbishop Cornelius Michael Power (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeattle, Diocese of Seattle, Washington
Ordained PriestSeattle, Diocese of Seattle, Washington
Ordained BishopCathedral, Seattle, Archdiocese of Seattle, Washington

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jun 2020

Quantcast