Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Xavier de Garaycoa Llaguno

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1775BornGuayaquil
15 Mar 179923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
15 Feb 183862.2AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
14 Oct 183862.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
5 Sep 185175.8AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
2 Dec 1859³84.0DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Xavier de Garaycoa Llaguno:
Archbishop Francisco Xavier de Garaycoa Llaguno (born , died ) Archbishop of Quito

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 475
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013